CHISWICK COMMUNITY DAY NURSERY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 280933
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
- Hounslow
Governance
Registration history:
- 24 September 1980: Standard registration
- 08 January 2007: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other names:
- CHISWICK COMMUNITY DAY NURSERY (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3RD SEPTEMBER 1980
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE CARE, EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN AGED 0-5 (INCLUSIVE) IN CHISWICK AND IN PARTICULAR TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY DAY NURSERY.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
CHISWICK
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window