GURDWARA SAHIB WOOLWICH (WOOLWICH SIKH TEMPLE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of our charity mainly consist of the following: a. Sikh religious prayers for the local community b. Ceremonials functions such as marriages and religious functions such as Sikh new years c. Facilties for teaching punjabi and english languages for any ages d. provision of facilities for the local school children visits as part of their educational program
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

26 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Greenwich
Governance
- 29 September 1980: Standard registration
- GREENWICH SIKH ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- WOOLWICH SIKH TEMPLE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
25 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NIRMAL KAILEY | Trustee | 03 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Mandeep Kaur Bains | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jagjeet Singh Bhansal | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Malkeet Singh | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Juginder Singh Puri | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tarlok Singh Kallar | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Baljinder Singh Boyal | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Manjit Singh Biring | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jaswinder Kaur Khunkhun | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
NARINDER PAUL SINGH JASSAL | Trustee | 26 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
DR Jagir Kaur Sekhon | Trustee | 27 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Parminder Singh Dhesi | Trustee | 27 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Narinder Pal Singh Bahia | Trustee | 27 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Balbir Singh Kundi | Trustee | 02 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
SATNAM SINGH NAGRA | Trustee | 02 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rashpal Kaur Sanghera | Trustee | 02 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ram SIngh Sangha | Trustee | 02 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
GURPAL SINGH HUNDAL | Trustee | 03 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
GURMUKH SINGH MANN | Trustee | 03 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
PREM SINGH BHODEY | Trustee | 03 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
GURMIT KAUR KHATTRA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HARJINDER SINGH SAINI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BALJINDER SINGH SIDHU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TARLOCHAN SINGH VAID | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SANTOKH SINGH RAI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £232.25k | £107.23k | £192.02k | £257.70k | £263.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £185.74k | £110.75k | £146.04k | £220.15k | £313.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £14.13k | £4.50k | £16.17k | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 July 2024 | 163 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 July 2024 | 163 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 NOVEMBER 1979 AS AMENDED 30 AUGUST 1980, 28 OCTOBER 1989, 24 SEPTEMBER 2000 AND 20 JANUARY 2008
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE SIKH RELIGION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RELIGIOUS WORSHIP AND CEREMONIES. 2. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE BENEFICIARIES. 3. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION A) BY THE PROVISION OF A LIBRARY IN THE FORM OF BOOKS ON RELIGION, RELIGIO HISTORICAL AND PROGRESSIVE SOCIAL LITERATURE IN PUNJABI, HINDI AND ENGLISH LANGUAGES. B) BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR TEACHING ENGLISH AND PUNJABI.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED - IN PRACTICE LONDON BOROUGH OF GREENWICH
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 CALDERWOOD STREET
WOOLWICH
LONDON
SE18 6QW
- Phone:
- 02088543224
- Email:
- GurdwaraPardhan@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window