PETERBOROUGH AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides a weekly summary of items from the local weekly newspaper in a recorded digital format for the use of visually impaired listeners
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
- Northamptonshire
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 24 September 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN COLLYER HUCKLESBY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sarah Elizabeth Powell | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barry Burrell | Trustee | 18 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.01k | £1.85k | £1.75k | £297 | £2.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.10k | £896 | £2.55k | £991 | £1.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 14 March 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 09 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12TH JUNE 1980
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE BLIND OR THE PARTIALLY SIGHTED OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OF DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN. BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED TAPES.
Area of benefit
PETERBOROUGH AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bretton Library
The Cresset
Rightwell
Bretton
Peterborough
PE3 8DS
- Phone:
- 01733864291
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window