Financial history LONDON SCRAP PROJECT LIMITED

Charity number: 281010
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £86.54k £55.69k £71.16k £78.59k £79.31k
Total expenditure £103.22k £87.62k £87.91k £85.11k £83.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A