LONDON SCRAP PROJECT LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We advance the education of recycle and re-use of commercial and industrial waste via our membership with schools,nurseries,community groups etc., and have a community re-paint scheme for members and other groups when we access funding. As funding allows,we hold competitions and workshops also,and look to move forward towards sustainability across the board.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hackney
Governance
- 10 October 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Morris Bennett | Trustee | 29 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Jackson-Reeves | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sally Emma Turner | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Jackson-Reeves | Trustee | 21 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Joseph | Trustee | 31 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH Britton | Trustee | 28 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
SONIA SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.54k | £55.69k | £71.16k | £78.59k | £79.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.22k | £87.62k | £87.91k | £85.11k | £83.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 March 2024 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 March 2023 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 March 2023 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 February 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 February 2021 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20TH JULY 1978 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30TH AUGUST 1980
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE DISTRIBUTION OF DONATED MATERIAL TO SCHOOLS, PLAYGROUPS AND OTHER CHARITABLE INTITUTIONS ESTABLISHED FOR EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Childrens Scrap Project
137 Homerton High Street
LONDON
E9 6AS
- Phone:
- 0208 985 6290
- Email:
- childrensscrap@btconnect.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window