WILLIAMS SYNDROME FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Williams Syndrome Foundation was formed in 1980 and is run for parents by parents with the dual aim of providing help and support to families and carers of WS people of all ages and of carrying out medical research. Annual national and local meetings are organised and research is funded by the Foundation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 November 1980: Standard registration
- 20 February 2017: Funds received from 1157604 FRIENDS OF NORTHANTS DISABILITY CRICKET
- THE INFANTILE HYPERCALCAEMIA FOUNDATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Richard Lawrie | Chair | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Roger Robinson | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael John Wolfman | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
BETHAN VASEY | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Jayne Spencer | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|||||
John Roy Folliss | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Meriel Jane Burrows | Trustee | 08 October 2012 |
|
|||||
LOUISE FISK | Trustee | 08 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £191.57k | £95.51k | £158.51k | £188.13k | £219.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £153.66k | £88.24k | £125.78k | £294.86k | £156.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15TH SEPTEMBER 1980 AS AMENDED ON 14 AUGUST 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 OCT 2015 as amended on 27 Jul 2022 as amended on 16 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION AS TO AND RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSE, DIAGNOSIS, RECOGNITION, EFFECTS AND TREATMENT OF WILLIAMS SYNDROME AND OTHER RELATED CONDITIONS AND FOR THE TREATMENT, CARE, EDUCATION AND ASSISTANCE OF THOSE AFFECTED BY SUCH CONDITIONS WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Box 103
5 Charter House
Lord Montgomery Way
PORTSMOUTH
PO1 2SN
- Phone:
- 02085671374
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window