THE BRITISH ROTORCRAFT MUSEUM AND AVON AIR COLLECTION LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preservation and conservation of Historial Rotorcraft.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Somerset
Governance
- 10 October 1980: Standard registration
- THE HELICOPTER MUSEUM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clive John Elks | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alisdair Edward James Wood EngD/CEng | Trustee | 16 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Henry Chalmers Winterton | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert David Adams | Trustee | 22 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN RICHARD WHITTAKER | Trustee | 28 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Captain Peter Turner | Trustee |
|
||||||
CAPTAIN ELFAN DYFED AP REES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFFREY WILLIAM DORE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £220.64k | £222.12k | £334.89k | £342.44k | £375.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £178.29k | £163.10k | £210.66k | £287.62k | £253.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £22.02k | £24.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 October 2022 | 266 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 October 2022 | 266 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 SEPTEMBER 1980, AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 21 OCTOBER 2004.
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND DEMONSTRATE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AIRCRAFT AND AERONAUTICAL EQUIPMENT OF HISTORICAL OR TECHNICAL INTEREST AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AVIATION GENERALLY.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
WESTON HELIPORT
LOCKING MOOR ROAD
WESTON-SUPER-MARE
SOMERSET
BS24 8PP
- Phone:
- 01934635227
- Email:
- helimuseum@btconnect.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window