THE FRIENDS OF ST PAUL'S SCHOOL, WINCHMORE HILL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable purposes for the raising of funds to be used for education/learning and purchase of teaching aids for the benefit of the children at St Pauls Primary school. We are also empowered to make grants to organisations including schools and other charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Enfield
Governance
- 13 October 1980: Standard registration
- FOSPS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Hine | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Athena Foran | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Victoria Newey | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Charlotte McDougall | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jefferson | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.38k | £34.72k | £37.40k | £33.59k | £43.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.95k | £42.99k | £37.09k | £31.74k | £28.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 28 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 28 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 26 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 26 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED JANUARY 1959 as amended on 06 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
1. TO CONTRIBUTE TOWARDS THE COST OF ERECTION OF A NEW CHURCH SCHOOL. 2. TO PROVIDE THOSE EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES FOR A PRIMARY SCHOOL WHICH ARE OUTSIDE THE SCOPE OF THE AUTHORITIES RESPONSIBLE FOR THE SCHOOL. 3. TO AID IN PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION FOR TEACHERS AT THE SCHOOL. 4. TO UPHOLD, MAINTAIN, EXTEND AND IMPROVE SUCH BUILDINGS WHEN ERECTED AND THE EQUIPMENT, GROUND, PLAYING FIELD AND FACILITY OF STUDY WORK TRAINING GAMES SPORTS AND RECREATIONS AT OR IN CONNECTION WITH THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. PAULS C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL
RINGWOOD WAY
LONDON
N21 2RA
- Phone:
- 02083603137
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window