Accounts and annual returns CRANSFORD VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 281092
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 13 December 2024 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 13 December 2024 379 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 13 December 2024 744 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 13 December 2024 1109 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 13 December 2024 1474 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required