Financial history CRANSFORD VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 281092
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £0 £181 £663 £2.03k £8.09k
Total expenditure £572 £870 £1.08k £1.43k £5.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A