THE AMHERST TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support of Abiah in their PEPE (Pre-school) work in the Favelas (slums) of Brazil and mission areas of South America and Africa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Brazil
Governance
- 24 October 1980: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN REID | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Eric Newman | Trustee | 10 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Lyn Christine | Trustee | 28 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Craig Lucas | Trustee | 20 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR STEPHEN ROBERT REID | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RONALD FRANK HYDE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.52k | £9.57k | £4.82k | £4.37k | £3.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.26k | £4.99k | £4.67k | £4.82k | £4.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 07 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21ST JULY 1980
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARIABLE PURPOSES OR CHARITABLE PURPOSE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THE ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 WATERS REACH
POYNTON
STOCKPORT
SK12 1XT
- Phone:
- 01625872842
- Email:
- suereid@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window