Accounts and annual returns ALL SAINTS (AXMINSTER) SCHOOL PARENTS/TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 281121
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 22 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 17 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 13 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 18 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required