Financial history ALL SAINTS (AXMINSTER) SCHOOL PARENTS/TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 281121
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £3.61k £2.21k £6.98k £5.63k £9.37k
Total expenditure £3.34k £4.25k £5.25k £4.45k £5.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A