ALL SAINTS (AXMINSTER) SCHOOL PARENTS/TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 281121
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the education of pupils in the school in particular by: 1. developing effective relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school; 2. engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education of the pupils.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £9,374
Total expenditure: £5,366

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 October 1980: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rhianne White Chair 19 March 2024
None on record
Carly Bartlett Trustee 05 October 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £3.61k £2.21k £6.98k £5.63k £9.37k
Total expenditure £3.34k £4.25k £5.25k £4.45k £5.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 22 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 17 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 13 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 18 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PTFA
All Saints Church of England
Primary School
Devon
EX13 7LX
Phone:
01297 32761
Website:

No information available