Financial history MILTON DAMEREL PARISH HALL

Charity Number: 281123
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £13.48k £18.90k £5.11k £8.21k £20.21k
Total expenditure £3.49k £1.19k £7.47k £22.50k £10.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.15k £17.58k N/A N/A £150