Accounts and annual returns HOUNSLOW LAW CENTRE LIMITED

Charity Number: 281136
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 21 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 21 December 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 20 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 27 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 04 February 2008 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 11 February 2008 11 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 31 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 31 January 2007 On Time