Financial history HOUNSLOW LAW CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 281136
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £371.05k £302.68k £207.61k £150.13k £135.63k
Total expenditure £424.65k £291.60k £240.69k £148.52k £143.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A