THE EGA HOSPITAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The EGA Hospital Charity supports both patients and staff at the hospital. We award a Travel Fellowship yearly for doctors travelling abroad to further their training. We help with improvement of hospital facilities, fund research projects and buy vital equipment such as for fetal surgery or postnatal care, and much more. The EGA Charity PhD Scholarship, funding PhD fees, started in 2022.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Camden
Governance
- 20 October 1980: Standard registration
- EGA APPEAL TRUST (Working name)
- ELIZABETH GARRETT ANDERSON HOSPITAL APPEAL (Previous name)
- ELIZABETH GARRETT ANDERSON HOSPITAL APPEAL TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MELANIE CLARE DAVIES MBBS FRCOG | Chair | 18 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark Turner | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Esther Kuria | Trustee | 21 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Nicola MacDonald | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Lavery | Trustee | 23 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Hogg | Trustee | 30 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr SIMON WADDINGTON | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Anna David | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.08k | £106.30k | £133.17k | £110.88k | £109.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.07k | £71.38k | £67.45k | £106.60k | £92.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30/09/1980 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 15/06/1992 AS AMENDED ON 27/05/2014 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 26 APR 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AMONG WOMEN AND THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE HEALTH OF WOMEN PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AT THE ELIZABETH GARRETT ANDERSON HOSPITAL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
EGA HOSPITAL CHARITY
2ND FLOOR NORTH
250 EUSTON ROAD
LONDON
NW1 2PG
- Phone:
- 07907 121 027
- Email:
- uclh.EGAcharity@nhs.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window