National Youth Music Theatre Ltd

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The National Youth Music Theatre exists to produce challenging music theatre work, both major productions and workshops, for young people of all backgrounds as participants and, in helping them to explore new and existing works, to inspire themselves and each other, and to give them the opportunity to achieve their highest aspirations, realising their talent, imagination and creativity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 October 1980: Standard registration
- 09 June 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 26 July 2010: Standard registration
- NATIONAL YOUTH MUSIC THEATRE (Working name)
- CHILDREN'S MUSIC THEATRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Munden | Chair | 15 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ebere Okereke | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Sheen | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Frederick Tapner | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HERMAN ALFRED REITMAN | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Jenny Cooke | Trustee | 30 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY WALKER | Trustee | 02 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £423.34k | £67.76k | £476.11k | £470.65k | £485.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £417.01k | £162.64k | £458.49k | £374.19k | £382.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £17.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 November 2021 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 November 2021 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 December 2020 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 December 2020 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22ND JULY 1980 AS AMENDED 25 JUNE 1997 as amended on 14 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY THE REPRODUCTION OF EDUCATIONAL PLAYS AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, BALLET, MUSIC, SINGING, LITERATURE, SCULPTURE AND PAINTING PROVIDED THAT ALL THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE OF A CHARITABLE NATURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 Third Avenue
Frinton-on-Sea
Essex
CO13 9EF
- Phone:
- 07852978377
- Email:
- enquiries@nymt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window