THE ISLE OF WIGHT BUDDHIST FELLOWSHIP
Charity Number: 281174
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Governance
Registration history:
- 19 November 1980: Standard registration
- 20 June 1991: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 20 June 1991: Funds transferred to 289913 BUDDHA - DHAMMA FELLOWSHIP
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
No accounts and annual returns information is available for this removed charity
Governing document
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH NOVEMBER 1978 AS AMENDED 1ST JULY 1979, 5TH OCTOBER 1980, 15TH FEBRUARY 1981, 21ST FEBRUARY 1982 AND 12TH DECEMBER 1982
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE BUDDHISM BY THE TEACHING OF THE THERAVADA SCHOOL OF BUDDHISM AND PROVIDING A RESIDENTIAL CENTRE IN THE ISLE OF WIGHT FOR BHIKKHUS TO TEACH AND PRACTICE BUDDHISM.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
THE ISLE OF WIGHT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.