HORSPATH STONE PIT CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Buildings
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 30 October 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HORSPATH PARISH COUNCIL | Trustee | 11 July 1988 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £125.00k | £100.08k | £187.56k | £250.00k | £250.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.03k | £94.32k | £68.16k | £37.28k | £41.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 June 2024 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 June 2024 | 132 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INCLOSURE AWARD OF 23 SEPTEMBER 1858 AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 11 JULY 1988 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION OF 6 OCTOBER 2020
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF HORSPATH AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HORSPATH
Contact information
- Address:
-
63 BOWYER ROAD
ABINGDON
OX14 2EP
- Phone:
- 01235534710
- Email:
- hayleykogel@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window