Friends Of Saint Lucia International

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main purposes are preventing or relieving poverty, advancing the arts, culture, heritage and promoting wider socio-economic change through educational activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- St Lucia
Governance
- 20 October 1980: Standard registration
- Friends Of Saint Lucia International (Working name)
- THE NATIONAL COMMITTEE FOR ST LUCIA HURRICANE RELIEF (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mr Mathew Melcher | Chair | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Craig Riviere | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
KAYLA CUDJOE | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Orleans Duncan | Trustee | 24 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Avril | Trustee | 24 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
SOLOMON ALEXIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Bertram Leon | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.03k | £1.57k | £300 | £856 | £2.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £455 | £150 | £0 | £20 | £3.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 9TH OCTOBER 1980 as amended on 01 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF NEED AND PHYSICAL AND MENTAL DISTRESS OCCASIONED BY OR IN CONSEQUENCE OF THE EFFECT IN ST LUCIA OF THE HURRICANE, THROUGH THE PROVISON OF MONEY, FOOD, BUILDING OR OTHER MATERIALS, VEHICLES, TOOLS, EQUIPMENT, SEEDS, FERTILISERS AND ANY OTHER NECESSITIES AND IN ANY OR ALL OTHER WAYS AS THE MEMBERS SHALL DECIDE.
Area of benefit
ST LUCIA, WEST INDIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Carpenters and Dockland Centre
98 Gibbins Road
LONDON
Stratford
E15 2HU
- Phone:
- 07535827301
- Email:
- info@friendsofstlucia.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window