EAST GRINSTEAD MUSIC AND ARTS FESTIVAL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organising and running of Music and Arts Festival.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 21 November 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul John Johnson | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Susan Jane Karaolis | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
ALAN REUTER | Trustee | 15 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Mandy Cunningham | Trustee | 15 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jill Spencer | Trustee | 09 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Reuter | Trustee | 16 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Carole Clark | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Hilary Needham | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Janet Topping | Trustee |
|
||||||
Jodie Clark | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Christine Mainstone | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.23k | £3.70k | £12.79k | £22.38k | £20.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.95k | £2.72k | £16.53k | £21.01k | £24.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 June 2024 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23RD SEPTEMBER 1977
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE GENERALLY, AND BY MEANS OF THE COMPETITION FESTIVAL MOVEMENT IN PARTICULAR THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF THE ARTS OF MUSIC, DANCING, ELOCUTION, LITERATURE AND ACTING IN ALL THEIR BRANCHES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 SOUTHLANDS
EAST GRINSTEAD
RH19 4DB
- Phone:
- 01342 314943
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
egmaf.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window