THE HENRY DE GRAY LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Thurrock
Governance
- 07 June 1980: Standard registration
- 24 April 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BENEVOLENT TRUST ACCOUNT (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2004 | 30/06/2005 | 30/06/2006 | 30/06/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44 | £51 | £51 | £35 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7TH JUNE 1980
Charitable objects
TO OR THE RELIEF OF SUCH POOR AND DISTRESED BROTHER MASONS OR OTHER POOR AND DISTRESSED WIDOWS AND CHILDREN OR TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH MASONIC CHARITIES OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS, SOCIETIES AND OBJECTS AS THE LODGE SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUED MEETING FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window