THE BARN EDUCATION ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provider of early years education to children between the ages of 2-4 in Kew, West London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £32,969 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Surrey
Governance
- 14 November 1980: Standard registration
- THE BARN NURSERY (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROWENA RIDOUT | Chair | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Baker | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sonal Patel | Trustee | 22 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Rees-Roberts | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £167.03k | £170.63k | £113.25k | £87.57k | £90.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £162.80k | £161.52k | £128.09k | £102.24k | £99.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £66.50k | £93.04k | £55.68k | £41.73k | £32.97k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 19 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 19 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13TH NOVEMBER 1967 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION 19TH JANUARY 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR WHERE SUCH FACILITIES ARE NOT AVAILABLE IN THE MAINTAINED OR AIDED SYSTEM OF EDUCATION AND WHARE CHILDREN ARE IN NEED AS A RESULT OF SOCIAL PHYSICAL OR MENTAL HANDICAP. (SEE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION FOR FULL DETAILS).
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Barn Church
Atwood Avenue
RICHMOND
Surrey
TW9 4HF
- Phone:
- 02084878911
- Email:
- manager@barnnursery.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window