Financial history BRISTOL CONGREGATIONAL ITINERANT LAY PREACHERS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 281255
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £41 £6 £1 £106 £1.20k
Total expenditure £85 £43 £35 £16 £77
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A