PROJECT S E E D

Charity Number: 281307
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Residential seminars and trips for families, with lectures/workshops and childrens programmes. One to one learning centres using volunteer tutors. Programmes for parents of children in primary schools. Home group regular discussions/education with a member of the seed staff. Large events with mixed educational/social content. Community-based educational and religious programmes.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £2,626
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 November 1980: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SEED (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARCEL BORDON Trustee
THE SALO BORDON CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE BEIT MIDRASH TRUST
Received: On time
PROJECT S.E.E.D. LIMITED
Received: On time
CONNECT (BOREHAMWOOD) LIMITED
Received: On time
THE BRITISH FRIENDS OF MASAT MOSHE
Received: 119 days late
THE MILLENNIUM TRUST
Received: 119 days late
MR LEIB LEVISON Trustee
PONEVEZ INSTITUTIONS BNEI-BRAQ ISRAEL
Received: On time
AREIVIM
Received: On time
TAHAROS BEIYUN
Received: On time
TORAH VODAAS LIMITED
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF KUPAT HAKAHAL KIRHYAT SEFER
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF ORCHOS TORAH
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF DR ADLER'S SURGERY
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF YESHIVAS BRISK
Received: On time
BEIS BRUCHA LTD
Received: On time
MARK MORRIS Trustee
TORAH AND CHESED (BH) LIMITED
Received: On time
BRITISH FRIENDS OF B'SHVILAYCH
Received: On time
INVESTREAM CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
WE HUB BUILDING
Received: On time
Leo Noe Trustee
RACHEL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE KEMACH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
David Rosenthal Trustee
Heritage Support Network
Received: On time
PROJECT S.E.E.D. LIMITED
Received: On time
BRIDGE LANE BETH HAMEDRASH GEMACH FUND
Received: On time
NWLJ SCHOOLS PLANNING COMMITTEE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £3.17k £3.92k £1.83k £2.07k £2.63k
Total expenditure £131.02k £90 £1.38k £19.38k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 18 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 28 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 01 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 18 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Seed
Mowbray House
58-70 Edgware Way
EDGWARE
Middlesex
HA8 8DJ
Phone:
02087821600