PATANJALI CENTRE FOR CLASSICAL YOGA TRUST LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Classical Yoga Teaching
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnet
- East Sussex
- Lancashire
Governance
- 06 November 1980: Standard registration
- PATANJALI YOGA CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN DOWN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sulekha Nath | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE DIANNE LEE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP JOHN DUFFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.58k | £4.37k | £9.08k | £6.07k | £1.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.10k | £4.22k | £18.38k | £5.83k | £5.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 February 2024 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5TH OCTOBER 1980
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE CLASSICAL TEACHINGS OF THE SCIENCE OF YOGA, BASED UPON THE PRINCIPLES OF THE HIGHEST STANDARDS OF PERSONAL CONDUCT AND SERVICE TO OTHERS. (B) TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF AND RESEARCH INTO THE THERAPEUTIC EFFECTS OF YOGA AS A MEANS OF IMPROVING THE MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND SPIRITUAL HEALTH OF THE COMMUNITY, AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lytchett House
Unit 13 Freeland Park
Wareham Road,Lytchett Matravers
POOLE
Dorset
BH16 6FA
- Phone:
- 07718511595
- Email:
- patanjalicentre@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window