BRENTWOOD CLUB FOR VISUALLY-IMPAIRED PERSONS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a twice monthly meeting place and several outings for visually impaired people living in the Brentwood, Essex area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 21 January 1981: Standard registration
- 27 September 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- BRENTWOOD VISUALLY HANDICAPPED CLUB (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.48k | £7.08k | £4.47k | £1 | £1.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.31k | £5.54k | £2.48k | £52 | £1.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 24 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21ST OCTOBER 1980 & AMENDED 6 NOVEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE CONDITION OF VISUALLY IMPAIRED PERSONS IN BRENTWOOD AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT, IN WAYS WHICH MAY INCLUDE ONE OR BOTH OF THE FOLLOWING: (I) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE ENHANCED. (II) THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL SERVICES AND/OR FACILITIES, PARTICULARLY THOSE WHICH AIM TO RELIEVE THE CONDITION OF VISUAL IMPAIRMENT.
Area of benefit
BRENTWOOD AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window