INSIGHT ALCOHOL & DRUG SERVICES LTD
Charity number: 281359
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Governance
Registration history:
- 05 November 1980: Standard registration
- 18 February 2004: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
- DEVON COUNCIL ON ALCOHOLISM LTD (Previous name)
- EXETER AND DISTRICT COUNCIL ON ALCOHOL AND DRUGS LIMITED (Previous name)
- INSIGHT ALCOHOL & DRUGS SERVICES LTD (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
No accounts and annual returns information is available for this removed charity
Governing document
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28TH APRIL 1977, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 11 AUGUST 1988, AND AMENDED 5 JULY 1996, AS AMENDED 5 JULY 1996
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE A BETTER AND MORE SYMPATHETIC UNDERSTANDING OF ALCOHOLISM TO STUDY ITS CAUSES AND EFFECTS AND TO UNDERTAKE AND TO CO-OPERATE WITH ALL RELEVANT AGENCIES IN THE PREVENTION, TREATMENT AND AFTERCARE OF ALCOHOLICS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
DEVON
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.