Financial history BAIN-UL-AQWAMI ANJMUN ASHAIT-UL ISLAM

Charity number: 281379
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £800 £720 £435 £1.26k £995
Total expenditure £600 £600 £145 £1.30k £675
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A