BAIN-UL-AQWAMI ANJMUN ASHAIT-UL ISLAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE RELIGIOUS EDUCATION TO MUSLIM CHILDREN AND ADULTS ALIKE, FACILITATE CELEBRATION OF ISLAMIC RELIGIOUS AND CULTURAL EVENTS, ASSIST AND PROMOTE ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED WITH SIMILAR OBJECTIVES, GENERALLY PROMOTE ISLAMIC FAITH AND VALUES AND PROMOTE RELIGIOUS TOLERANCE AND HARMONY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
- Luton
Governance
- 15 December 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MEHBOOB KHAN | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MOHAMMED RASHID | Trustee |
|
||||||||
ABDUL AZIZ QAZI | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £800 | £720 | £435 | £1.26k | £995 | |
|
Total expenditure | £600 | £600 | £145 | £1.30k | £675 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21ST OCTOBER 1980 AS AMENDED 13TH DECEMBER 1981 AND 8TH APRIL 1984
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE RELIGION OF ISLAM ACCORDING TO THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICE OF AHLE SUNNAT WAL JAMAAT (SEE CONSTITUTION FOR FURTHER DETAILS) AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MUSLIM CHILDREN BASED ON ISLAMIC TEACHINGS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
25A WESTBOURNE ROAD
LUTON
LU4 8JD
- Phone:
- 01582419885
- Email:
- info@ghousiatrust.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window