LOSTWITHIEL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Association manages the Community Centre which provides facilities for indoor sports, social, educational and recreational activities, weddings, public and private functions, and a com cafe The Centre is also the natural local venue for antique fairs, toy fairs, craft and other fairs, as also for concerts, conferences, and musical and theatrical events staged by local and visiting grou
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 06 January 1981: Standard registration
- 24 June 2022: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 24 June 2022: Funds transferred to 1168401 LOSTWITHIEL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.57k | £28.99k | £39.97k | £35.19k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £106.44k | £25.64k | £34.04k | £34.48k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 13 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 13 January 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 07 May 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | 07 May 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25TH SEPTEMBER 1980 AS AMENDED 16 MARCH 2004
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LOSTWITHIEL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OS SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS (B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE" AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
LOSTWITHIEL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window