THE CARNIVOROUS PLANT SOCIETY

Charity number: 281423
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We promote the study and conservation of carnivorous plants by publishing a newsletter/journal and cultivation guidance, operating a website, maintaining an extensive seedbank, participating in shows and events, and funding conservation and research projects.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £9,283
Total expenditure: £4,117

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 June 1981: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Penny Wright Trustee 04 May 2024
None on record
Matt Portrey Trustee 04 May 2024
None on record
Christopher WJC Wheeler Trustee 04 May 2024
None on record
David Browne Trustee 04 May 2024
None on record
Nik McIntyre Trustee 04 May 2024
None on record
Dr Paul Richards Trustee 04 May 2024
None on record
Stephen Morley Trustee 13 August 2022
None on record
Ian Ronald Ladd Trustee 26 March 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.69k £6.00k £5.80k £7.68k £9.28k
Total expenditure £12.01k £7.38k £1.97k £3.87k £4.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 February 2025 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 28 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 October 2022 249 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
32 Plum Tree Way
SCUNTHORPE
DN16 1LL
Phone:
07808584290