Financial history SIR ROBERT SPEED CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 281440
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £59.21k £59.81k £73.81k £68.23k £92.82k
Total expenditure £58.34k £36.02k £74.09k £67.05k £71.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A