SELSEY CANCER RELIEF FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Jumble sales in Selsey West Sussex
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- West Sussex
Governance
- 07 June 1985: Standard registration
- SELSEY AND DISTRICT LEAGUE OF FRIENDS TO THE LEONARD SPENCER FUND FOR CANCER RELIEF (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HELEM BROWN | Trustee | 20 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM RODNEY TRUSS | Trustee | 02 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.58k | £2.33k | £5.20k | £2.97k | £3.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.50k | £0 | £0 | £100 | £12.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17TH NOVEMBER 1980 AS AMENDED 25TH APRIL 1991.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM CANCER BY (A) PROVIDING OR CONTRIBUTING TO THE COST OF PROVIDING EQUIPMENT FOR ST MARY'S HOSPITAL RADIOTHERAPY UNIT OR OTHER INSTITUTION PROVIDING TREATMENT OF CANCER; (B) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES FOR THE RELIEF OF CANCER SUFFERERS IN SELSEY AND DISTRICT.
Area of benefit
SELSEY AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Beverley Close
Selsey
CHICHESTER
PO20 0DR
- Phone:
- 01243604391
- Email:
- SUSANTRUSS4@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window