Governing document SHERINGHAM AND CROMER CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 281467
Up to date
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/12/1980 AS AMENDED ON 28/01/2008 AS AMENDED ON 09/09/2013 as amended on 26 Nov 2018 as amended on 20 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CHORAL CONCERTS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NORTH NORFOLK
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.