Accounts and annual returns VITA ET PAX SCHOOL (COCKFOSTERS) LIMITED

Charity number: 281566
Charity reporting is up to date (227 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 12 February 2025 227 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 12 February 2025 227 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 01 July 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 01 July 2023 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 09 August 2022 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 24 August 2022 55 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 August 2021 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 09 August 2021 40 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 January 2021 190 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 06 January 2021 190 days late Download Open in new window