THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST DEMETRIOS OF EDMONTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
-Runs the church -Provides: School & Food Bank
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £11,587 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Enfield
Governance
- 02 February 1981: Standard registration
- ST DEMETDRIOS CHURCH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew John Powell | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANDREAS DEMETRIOU | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
DEMETRIOS NICOLAS DEMETRIOU | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|||||
ELIAS ELIA | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|||||
HIS EMINENCE ARCHBISHOP NIKITAS LIOULIAS | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
MYROFORA DOUKAKI | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
SOTEROULLA STYLIANOU | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL GEORGE ERACLEOUS | Trustee | 16 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
APOSTOLOS CHRISTOFI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MELIS ANTONIS OURRIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £479.70k | £389.71k | £402.32k | £477.94k | £490.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £390.82k | £373.19k | £378.80k | £450.28k | £476.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £11.59k | £11.59k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 November 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 November 2024 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 February 2021 | 111 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30TH OCTOBER 1980
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE GREEK ORTHODOX FAITH AND GREEK ORTHODOX CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS IN THE BOROUGH OF ENFIELD AND ENVIRONS TO SUPPORT, EXPAND AND DEVELOP A GREEK ORTHODOX SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nicholas & Co Solicitors Ltd
10-12 Bourlet Close
LONDON
W1W 7BR
- Phone:
- 02073234450
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window