MERCIAN VOLUNTEERS REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve persons who are serving or who have served in the 1st and 2nd Battalions of the Mercian Volunteers and in the Worcestershire and Staffordshire Companies of the Light Infantry and Mercian Volunteers and their widows, children or other dependents who are in conditions of need, hardship or distress. To promote the efficiency of the Mercian Volunteers and to maintain its traditions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Birmingham City
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Derbyshire
- Dudley
- Nottinghamshire
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 19 December 1980: Standard registration
- MERCIAN VOLUNTEERS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lt Col Retd Anthony Angel | Trustee | 13 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Mike Pilkington | Trustee | 13 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stuart McDonald | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Whaite | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mick Langley | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mr R Bates | Trustee | 06 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £578 | £1.04k | £1.25k | £2.33k | £498 | |
|
Total expenditure | £295 | £1.27k | £1.23k | £1.83k | £724 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 6 NOVEMBER 1980 AS AMENDED ON 27 SEPTEMBER 2005, 8 MARCH 2006, 18 MARCH 2007 AND 6 MARCH 2011
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS WHO ARE SERVING OR WHO HAVE SERVED IN THE 1ST AND 2ND BATTALIONS OF THE MERCIAN VOLUNTEERS AND IN THE WORCESTERSHIRE AND STAFFORDSHIRE COMPANIES OF THE FORMER LIGHT INFANTRY AND MERCIAN VOLUNTEERS AND THEIR WIDOWS, CHILDREN OR OTHER DEPENDANTS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. 2. TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE MERCIAN VOLUTEERS AND TO MAINTAIN ITS TRADITIONS AND ITS ESPRIT DE CORPS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 Merston Drive
Didsbury
MANCHESTER
Select
M20 5NT
- Phone:
- 07786544286
- Email:
- tonyangel22@outlook.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window