Governing document Allied Universal Employees' Trust
Charity Number: 281616

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF VARIATION DATED 3RD DECEMBER 1980 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 25 APRIL 2006 AND RESOLUTION DATED 16TH NOV 2009. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14 FEB 2025 as amended on 12 May 2025
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG AND FOR DESERVING POOR AND NECESSITOUS EMPLOYEES AND DEPENDANTS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.