Financial history ANTRYVALE LTD

Charity number: 281620
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/03/2020 28/03/2021 28/03/2022 28/03/2023 28/03/2024
Total gross income £39.51k £37.00k £34.80k £34.80k £0
Total expenditure £41.60k £59.78k £16.75k £16.75k £396
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A