HERTFORDSHIRE CHORUS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Large symphonic choral society combining the classical repertoire with a strong interest in innovative programming; commissioning new work; and involving young people in its concerts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 28 January 1981: Standard registration
- HERTFORDSHIRE CHORUS (Working name)
- HATFIELD PHILHARMONIC CHORUS (Previous name)
- THE HERTFORDSHIRE CHORUS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Jennifer Chappell | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul James Harden | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philippe Michael Broadhead | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Evelyn Mary Poulton | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Philip Keogh | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Isabel Hughes | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carole Sandra Teacher | Trustee | 26 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Neil Geoffrey Brinkworth | Trustee | 26 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.48k | £39.00k | £106.03k | £98.84k | £111.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.57k | £23.79k | £114.32k | £117.71k | £109.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £600 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 07 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 07 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02/07/1980 AS AMENDED ON 26/09/2001 AS AMENDED ON 30/11/2011 as amended on 13 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS TO THE HIGHEST POSSIBLE STANDARD AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE CHORUS, THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE, SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Barncroft Way
ST. ALBANS
Hertfordshire
AL1 5QZ
- Phone:
- 01727863521
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window