THE ELTHAM GREEN FELLOWSHIP TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activities are: 1) The running of Eltham Green Community Church, a Christian church providing a place of worship, teaching, and activities for all ages. 2) The financial support of Christian workers both in the UK and globally. 3) The support of other Christian works in the local area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Greenwich
Governance
- 07 January 1981: Standard registration
- ELTHAM GREEN CHRISTIAN CENTRE (Working name)
- Eltham Green Community Church (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Bull | Chair | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nyaladzi Balogun | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kristen Adeyemi | Trustee | 15 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Terence Watson | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £191.28k | £213.82k | £200.33k | £186.49k | £180.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £160.19k | £226.84k | £213.08k | £180.66k | £186.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £728 | £6.43k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 April 2021 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 April 2021 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22ND OCTOBER 1980
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Eltham Green Fellowship Trust
542 Westhorne Avenue
LONDON
SE9 6DH
- Phone:
- 0208 850 1331
- Email:
- louisa.bull@egcc.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window