Society for Post-Medieval Archaeology (The)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote awareness of post-medieval archaeology through sponsoring conferences and research, by publishing a journal and newsletter, and by encouraging student participation and public engagement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

16 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 January 1981: Standard registration
- THE SOCIETY FOR POST-MEDIEVAL ARCHAEOLOGY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Hanna Louise Steyne Chamberlin | Chair | 15 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Carlo Citter | Trustee | 15 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Megan Christina Crutcher | Trustee | 15 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joel Rodrigues Oliveira dos Santos | Trustee | 15 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jamie Farrington | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tania Casimiro | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Monika Reppo | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sanna Lipkin | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katharine Alice Whitaker | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Helen Loney | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Magdalena Ewa NAum | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kathryn Sampek | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Erki Russow | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lenore Thompson | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lara Band | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Blessing Chidimuro | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.34k | £21.11k | £23.33k | £20.91k | £26.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.04k | £14.91k | £21.88k | £21.85k | £21.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 17 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 22 June 2023 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 20 June 2022 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6TH FEBRUARY 1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 28TH SEPTEMBER 1980 AND 28TH SEPTEMBER 1980 AND 27TH SEPTEMBER 2002 AND 29 OCTOBER 2005 as amended on 12 Aug 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE STUDY OF THE ARCHAEOLOGICAL EVIDENCES OF THE HISTORY OF THE POST-MEDIEVAL PERIOD, TO EDUCATE AND INSTRUCT THE PUBLIC BY THE FURTHERANCE OF THAT STUDY, COLLATE, PUBLISH AND SELL MATERIAL AND INFORMATION OF SERVICE OR INTEREST TO THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIETY AND TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
FAO Hanna Steyne - SPMA
C/O Wessex Archaeology
Old Sarum Park
Old Sarum
Salisbury
SP4 6EB
- Phone:
- 01782 969712
- Email:
- secretary@spma.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window