WINDMILL DAY NURSERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHILDCARE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 25 February 1981: Standard registration
- 12 December 2024: Funds received from 226538 YARBURGH CHILDRENS TRUST
- ZOPHAH DAY NURSERY (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HANNAH MARIE SEARLE | Chair | 16 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sebastien Jean Marc Girard | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Clare Louise Barnett | Trustee | 21 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Saskia Lianne Levitt | Trustee | 02 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nikole King | Trustee | 30 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £455.36k | £370.61k | £290.21k | £278.76k | £266.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £496.02k | £358.25k | £328.89k | £249.35k | £260.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 November 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 November 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 July 2024 | 245 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 September 2024 | 311 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 July 2024 | 610 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 July 2024 | 610 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 May 2022 | 188 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 May 2022 | 188 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 February 2021 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 February 2021 | 102 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH FEBRUARY 1981 AS AMENDED ON 31ST OCTOBER 1996. AS AMENDED ON 30 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW SCHOOL AGE BY PROVIDING SAFE AND SATISFACTORY GROUP PLAY, IN WHICH PARENTS TAKE PART WHEN APPROPRIATE. 2. PROVIDE CARE FOR PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN ON WEEKDAYS. 3. ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS MAY HELP THEIR CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Yarburgh
Highfield Road
East Grinstead
RH19 2DX
- Phone:
- 01342328544
- Email:
- info@windmilldaynursery.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window