UNITED KINGDOM TURKISH ISLAMIC ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a place to worship and facilities for education and religious studies for Muslims. It also endeavours to help those in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 28 January 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SINAN ZORLU | Chair | 27 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
YASAR CEVIK | Trustee | 27 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
EBU BEKIR TEZGEL | Trustee | 27 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
ABDURRAHMAN GUC | Trustee | 27 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
RESUL ASAM | Trustee | 27 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
MUSTAFA NALBANT | Trustee | 27 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
HAKAN CAMUZ | Trustee | 27 February 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £244.77k | £255.10k | £237.23k | £266.96k | £293.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £230.17k | £231.87k | £260.71k | £293.58k | £328.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.70k | £12.00k | N/A | £2.30k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 February 2025 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 February 2025 | 99 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 September 2024 | 308 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2024 | 332 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 May 2023 | 212 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 May 2023 | 212 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 May 2022 | 184 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 May 2022 | 184 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH JULY 1980 AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 13 MAY 2007.
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM. 2. TO RELIEVE SUCH MEMBERS OF THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES. 3. TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS AND DOCTRINES OF ISLAM AND TRADITIONS OF TURKISH CULTURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
117 - 119 STOKE NEWINGTON ROAD
LONDON
N16 8BU
- Phone:
- 02072540046
- Email:
- enquiries@aziziye.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window