QUWWATUL ISLAM HEMEL HEMPSTEAD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MOSQUE, RELIGIOUS ORGANISATION FOR THE WELFARE OF ALL THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY IN HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 21 January 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tabrez Khan | Trustee | 05 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abrar Khan | Trustee | 05 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ajmal Fazal | Trustee | 05 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thalab Sadiq | Trustee | 05 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
HABIB KHAN | Trustee | 27 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £168.20k | £98.72k | £59.68k | £134.69k | £153.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.29k | £58.71k | £59.54k | £58.25k | £67.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 November 2021 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 November 2021 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/05/1980 AS AMENDED ON 24/05/1987 AS AMENDED ON 09/05/2003 AS AMENDED ON 23/12/2011 ADOPTED 15/01/2016
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGION OF ISLAM AND ISLAMIC EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
150 ST. ALBANS HILL
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
HP3 9NH
- Phone:
- 01442243785
- Email:
- latifhussain786@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
hemelmosque.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window