FAIRLEY HOUSE SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Special educational needs school for dyslexic and dyspraxic children aged 6 -13. Unique whole school trans-disciplinary approach integrates education with occupational therapy and speech and language therapy. Charity aims to provide a period of intensive remediation and then return pupils into mainstream education at the earliest opportunity - average stay at the school is seven terms.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income:
£8,194,329
Donations and legacies | £14.55k | |
Charitable activities | £8.00m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £165.50k | |
Other | £11.09k |
Total expenditure:
£8,036,929
Raising funds | £2.36k | |
Charitable activities | £8.03m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £4,676,164 from 137 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.36k | |
Charitable expenditure | £8.03m | |
Retained for future use | £157.40k |
People

82 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 9 |
£70k to £80k | 5 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 02 January 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexandra Gamon | Trustee | 07 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ali Azam | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Shalom | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Dore | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tina Tietjen | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Dixon | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jolyon Luke | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
SARAH HAMILTON-FAIRLEY | Trustee | 25 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAUL BARNABY | Trustee | 20 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.52m | £6.45m | £6.53m | £7.99m | £8.19m | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.51m | £6.27m | £6.51m | £6.84m | £8.04m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.51m | £2.64m | £3.06m | £4.20m | £4.68m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £9.28k | £3.55k | £17.74k | £31.82k | £14.55k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £6.41m | £6.34m | £6.47m | £7.84m | £8.00m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £14.00k | £1.24k | £9.60k | £111.94k | £165.50k | |
|
Income - Other | £88.25k | £62.01k | £29.09k | £13.15k | £11.09k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £6.51m | £6.27m | £6.48m | £6.84m | £8.03m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £2.39k | £995 | £23.36k | £4.23k | £2.36k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.64k | £7.17k | £7.17k | £12.33k | £20.15k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £5.32m | £5.33m | £5.14m | £4.92m | £4.79m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £4.41m | £4.54m | £5.15m | £6.67m | £7.08m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.12m | £3.12m | £3.53m | £3.68m | £3.80m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/12/1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/11/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/03/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/07/2014 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 11/07/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01/08/2014
Charitable objects
3.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN WITH DYSLEXIA AND/OR DYSPRAXIA AND/OR RELATED LEARNING OR LANGUAGE DIFFICULTIES; AND 3.2 TO UNDERTAKE AND PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND PROBLEMS OF AND ASSOCIATED WITH DYSLEXIA, DYSPRAXIA AND RELATED LEARNING OR LANGUAGE DIFFICULTIES AND INTO THE METHODS OF DIAGNOSING ASSESSING ADVISING ON TREATING AND EDUCATING SUCH CHILDREN, AND TO DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
FAIRLEY HOUSE SCHOOL
30 CAUSTON STREET
LONDON
SW1P 4AU
- Phone:
- 0207 976 5456
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window