FRIENDS OF THE EARTH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of the Earth Charitable Trust is committed to the conservation, protection and improvement of the environment. It promotes sustainable development for the public benefit by funding work that includes campaigning, research, education and publishing, and the provision of information on environmental problems and their solutions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£14,950,721
Donations and legacies | £14.88m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £29.68k | |
Investments | £38.41k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£13,817,159
Raising funds | £2.56m | |
Charitable activities | £11.26m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.56m | |
Charitable expenditure | £11.26m | |
Retained for future use | £1.13m |
People

201 Employee(s)
4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 9 |
£70k to £80k | 4 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 06 January 1981: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF THE EARTH TRUST (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF THE EARTH TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sian Ferguson | Chair | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Downes | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Eldred | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Melanie Oley | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.12m | £15.96m | £13.45m | £12.77m | £14.95m | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.76m | £14.49m | £13.43m | £13.49m | £13.82m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £7.88m | £12.49m | £12.86m | £12.72m | £14.88m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £70.79k | £3.09m | £36.08k | £27.99k | £29.68k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.16m | £358.30k | £543.15k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £12.77k | £12.60k | £12.13k | £17.24k | £38.41k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.53m | £1.28m | £1.00m | £1.76m | £3.26m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £8.81m | £13.54m | £11.77m | £10.82m | £11.26m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £947.63k | £955.56k | £1.66m | £2.68m | £2.56m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £33.91k | £29.59k | £24.49k | £23.60k | £20.04k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £7.54m | £11.86m | £9.79m | £8.82m | £9.19m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £639.69k | £615.55k | £744.89k | £1.38m | £1.92m | |
|
Long-term investments | £248.03k | £248.03k | £248.03k | £248.03k | £520.00k | |
|
Other assets | £1.80m | £3.02m | £3.19m | £2.23m | £2.46m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £495.83k | £226.57k | £510.69k | £914.98k | £820.71k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 06 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 06 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/12/1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/02/1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/12/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/10/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 APR 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09 NOV 2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23 AUG 2018
Charitable objects
A. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ECOLOGY, NATURAL HISTORY,RESOURCE CONSERVATION, SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND ENVIRONMENTAL STUDIES; B. THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND SUSTAINABLE USE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE EARTH'S NATURAL ENVIRONMENT INCLUDING BIO-DIVERSITY, ATMOSPHERE, WATER, LAND AND NATURAL RESOURCES; C. THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (I) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION, AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES; (II)CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. 'SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT' MEANS IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE WHILE LIVING WITHIN THE CARRYING CAPACITY OF SUPPORTING ECOSYSTEMS AND THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT. 2.2 NOTHING IN THE ARTICLES SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Friends of The Earth
139 Clapham Road
LONDON
SW9 0HP
- Phone:
- 0800581051
- Email:
- info@foe.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window